TN HB0910 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/25/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/25/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits local governments from dismissing, disciplining, fining, or penalizing a jailer or corrections officer employed by a local government, or denying employment to a person applying to be a jailer or corrections officer, based on where the jailer or corrections officer or applicant resides. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8, Chapter 50 and Title 8, Chapter 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8, Chapter 50 and Title 8, Chapter 8, relative to residency requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/25/2023 | |
2023-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 240 | |
2023-04-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-04 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-30 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-30 | House | Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 16, PNV 0 |
2023-03-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2023 |
2023-03-27 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3/30/23 |
2023-03-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/27/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-16 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0923 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 240