TN HB0917 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, for purposes of a retired member of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system (TCRS), or a retiree of a local retirement fund, returning to work temporarily, authorizes the submission in an electronic format by the head of the employing entity, or the head's designee, certification to the retirement division of the member's name, period to be employed, number of days to be worked, compensation to be paid, and anticipated termination date, and a statement showing working hours and compensation for the retiree. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 8, relative to retirement.
Sponsors
Rep. Iris Rudder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0846 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-29 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2024