TN HB0927 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that a warden may have the body of an inmate who dies in a penitentiary buried or cremated. - Amends TCA Title 41.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that a warden may have the body of an inmate who dies in a penitentiary buried or cremated. - Amends TCA Title 41.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0783 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback