TN HB0981 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, vacates and reconstitutes the Tennessee emergency medical services board, as of July 1, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3, relative to the Tennessee emergency medical services board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 265 | |
2023-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2023 |
2023-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/3/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2023-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-14 | House | Sponsor change. |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0669 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/24/2023, 06/30/2023