TN HB1004 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions in higher education to include all state governing boards and not just the board of regents or the UT system due to the implementation of the FOCUS Act. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 14; Section 49-7-118 and Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 30.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions in higher education to include all state governing boards and not just the board of regents or the UT system due to the implementation of the FOCUS Act. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 14; Section 49-7-118 and Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 30.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 28 | |
2017-03-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/9/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0994 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 28