TN HB1029 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits certain flame retardants in children's products and residential upholstered furniture. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 131.
Title
As introduced, prohibits certain flame retardants in children's products and residential upholstered furniture. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 131.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1049 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee