TN HB1089 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies which jurisdictions are eligible to hold a referendum to authorize the sale of wine in retail food stores. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3, Part 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, Chapter 3, Part 8, relative to wine in grocery stores referendums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 178 | |
2023-03-30 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-03-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/8/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1214 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/17/2023