TN HB1264 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Failed In s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Failed In s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces alcohol level required to constitute offense of DUI from .08 percent to .02 percent for person with one or more prior DUI convictions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, reduces alcohol level required to constitute offense of DUI from .08 percent to .02 percent for person with one or more prior DUI convictions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-22 - House - CRIMINAL PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE OF JUD: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Failed In s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-02-24 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1635 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.