TN HB1281 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes a family medicine student loan repayment grant program to incentivize physicians in residency training to provide medical health services in health resource shortage areas following completion of their training. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49 and Title 63, relative to incentivizing physicians to provide medical health services in underserved areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2023 | |
2023-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 414 | |
2023-05-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-05-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-04-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar 2 for 4/19/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/3/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/13/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration-- Government Operations for Review |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0781 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 414