TN HB1299 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the provision that transferred the duties required of the Tennessee industrial development authority as of June 30, 1981, relative to the outstanding loan guarantees and commitments made by the authority, to the department of economic and community development. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 9 and Title 67, relative to economic and community development.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Vital [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1351 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee