TN HB1301 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, sets a maximum fee of $20.00 for towing firms to charge to release a motor vehicle attached for towing, but not yet transported to another location, when the motor vehicle is parked without authority on private property; provides that a violation is a Class C misdemeanor. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As introduced, sets a maximum fee of $20.00 for towing firms to charge to release a motor vehicle attached for towing, but not yet transported to another location, when the motor vehicle is parked without authority on private property; provides that a violation is a Class C misdemeanor. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Jeremy Durham [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2015-03-25 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1093 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1301&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1301.pdf |