TN HB1339 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to actively seek and apply for federal grants and other available federal funds, and utilize available federal funds, for the purpose of alleviating childhood hunger. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 71, relative to the department of human services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2023-04-10 | House | Sponsor change. |
2023-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2023-02-15 | House | Sponsor change. |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1505 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-09 - Sponsor(s) Added.