TN HB1401 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Affordability is Access Act," which requires individual and group health plans to provide coverage for over-the-counter contraceptives that have been approved for use by the federal food and drug administration. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 53 and Title 56.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 53 and Title 56, relative to contraceptives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0938 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.