TN HB1409 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Pub. Ch. 534
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Pub. Ch. 534
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, suspends, for 48 hours after the execution of a writ of possession, the actions of any local government relative to the disposition of personal property; prohibits a plaintiff, after the execution of a writ of possession, from disposing of the personal property of a defendant for 48 hours. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 29, Chapter 18, Part 1 and Title 66.
Title
As enacted, suspends, for 48 hours after the execution of a writ of possession, the actions of any local government relative to the disposition of personal property; prohibits a plaintiff, after the execution of a writ of possession, from disposing of the personal property of a defendant for 48 hours. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 29, Chapter 18, Part 1 and Title 66.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Business and Utilities Committe (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Business and Utilities Committe (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 534 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-02-27 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2014-02-27 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0674) |
2014-02-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/27/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/20/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Action Def. in Business and Utilities Committee to 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 2/12/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/4/2014 |
2014-01-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2014-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2014-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1732 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 534