TN HB1410 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Failed for lack of second in: K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Failed for lack of second in: K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes, instead of requires, an LEA or public charter school to retain a student in the third grade if the student has not shown a basic understanding of the curriculum and an ability to perform the skills required in the subject of reading or English language arts; requires an LEA or public charter school that conducts a learning loss bridge camp to offer a third-grade student identified for retention the opportunity to attend the camp before the start of the next school year; prohibits an LEA or public charter school from requiring a student to attend a learning loss bridge camp. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to student retention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | House | Failed for lack of second in: K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1265 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee