TN HB1444 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes changes to present law relative to criminal offenses involving motor vehicles. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 55, relative to criminal law.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] |
Rep. Greg Martin [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2023 | |
2023-05-17 | Pub. Ch. 416 | |
2023-05-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-05-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 2 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0353) |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0502) |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-04-20 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 80, Nays 16, PNV 0 |
2023-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0450) |
2023-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0415) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/19/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/11/2023 |
2023-04-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-08 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1349 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 416