TN HB1479 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Effective date(s) 03/23/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Effective date(s) 03/23/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows the state treasurer to purchase and sell physical gold and precious metal. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 8, relative to the purchase of gold and precious metals on behalf of the state.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Effective date(s) 03/23/2023 | |
2023-03-28 | Pub. Ch. 69 | |
2023-03-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-03-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-03-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-03-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-06 | House | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-02 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/6/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/2/2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/22/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0519 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 69