TN HB1482 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of audit, as part of its performance review of state entities under the governmental entity review law, to conduct a comprehensive analysis of the extent to which the entity is in compliance with Title VI of the Civil Rights Act. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of audit, as part of its performance review of state entities under the governmental entity review law, to conduct a comprehensive analysis of the extent to which the entity is in compliance with Title VI of the Civil Rights Act. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar |
2020-06-16 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2020-06-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/20 |
2020-02-24 | House | Held on desk. |
2020-02-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/20/2020 |
2019-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Reassigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1294 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee