TN HB1487 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, restricts political activity of members of the registry of election finance only during the duration of their term rather than during their term and one year subsequent to their term. - Amends TCA Section 2-10-203.
Title
As enacted, restricts political activity of members of the registry of election finance only during the duration of their term rather than during their term and one year subsequent to their term. - Amends TCA Section 2-10-203.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 78 | |
2019-03-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1113 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 78