TN HB1535 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1001
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1001
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, reduces the capital investment requirement for eligibility for qualified data center sales and use tax exemptions from $250 million to $100 million; exempts cooling equipment and backup power equipment sold or used by qualified data centers from the sales and use tax; requires qualified data center that applies for job tax credits to certify that it has not, within the previous 12 months, been found to be in violation of certain laws. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, reduces the capital investment requirement for eligibility for qualified data center sales and use tax exemptions from $250 million to $100 million; exempts cooling equipment and backup power equipment sold or used by qualified data centers from the sales and use tax; requires qualified data center that applies for job tax credits to certify that it has not, within the previous 12 months, been found to be in violation of certain laws. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald McCormick [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
Rep. Jason Zachary [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1001 | |
2016-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-11 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2016-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-01-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2537 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 1001
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1535&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1535.pdf |