TN HB1649 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 03/15/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 03/15/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires LEAs and public charter schools of a county to be closed for instruction on presidential primary election days if the county election commission uses such schools as a polling place. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 1, relative to elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] | Rep. Elaine Davis [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] |
Rep. John Crawford [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/15/2024 | |
2024-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 573 | |
2024-03-15 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-03-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-02-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/15/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-31 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 1/31/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1836 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 573