TN HB1656 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Failed in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Failed in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the issuance of traffic citations based solely on evidence obtained from unmanned traffic cameras used to monitor and enforce traffic signal violations or speed limits. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the issuance of traffic citations based solely on evidence obtained from unmanned traffic cameras used to monitor and enforce traffic signal violations or speed limits. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-29 - House - HOUSE SAFETY & FUNDING SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | Failed in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Safety & Funding Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2002 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/18/2020