TN HB1708 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the commissioner of health to develop a plan for ensuring that 90 percent of pregnant women in this state have access to prenatal care and to report concerning such plan to the house health and human resources committee and the senate general welfare, health and human resources committee by February 1, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, directs the commissioner of health to develop a plan for ensuring that 90 percent of pregnant women in this state have access to prenatal care and to report concerning such plan to the house health and human resources committee and the senate general welfare, health and human resources committee by February 1, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HHR SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Health & Human Resources Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 2012 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal HHR Subcommittee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of HHR | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1178 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. GW,H&HR Comm.