TN HB1720 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires annual review of TennCare MCO network adequacy of service providers for children to demonstrate such adequacy by clear and convincing evidence. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires annual review of TennCare MCO network adequacy of service providers for children to demonstrate such adequacy by clear and convincing evidence. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1825 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-25 - Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1720&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1720.pdf |