TN HB1720 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires county clerks to retain $3.00 of the $11.00 fee for noting liens, encumbrances, or mortgages on a certificate of title; requires the retained funds to be earmarked for office supplies and equipment related to the notations. - Amends TCA Section 55-6-101.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires county clerks to retain $3.00 of the $11.00 fee for noting liens, encumbrances, or mortgages on a certificate of title; requires the retained funds to be earmarked for office supplies and equipment related to the notations. - Amends TCA Section 55-6-101.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-03HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-05-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020
2020-03-18HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-11HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-03-04HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-02-26HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/4/2020
2020-02-25HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2020-02-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 2/25/2020
2020-01-23HouseAssigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2020-01-23HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2020-01-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-21HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2904 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/18/2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback