TN HB1720 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from Class E and Class D to a Class C felony the classification of theft of a firearm valued at less than $60,000 and related offenses; specifies that it is a Class C felony to receive, possess, store, barter, sell, transfer, or dispose of a stolen firearm or firearm ammunition. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-01-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2574 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-01 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 1