TN HB1775 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 851
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 851
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the garnishment of earnings; changes references from garnishment of "salaries, wages or other compensation" to garnishment of "earnings". - Amends TCA Title 26, Chapter 2 and Title 29, Chapter 7.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing the garnishment of earnings; changes references from garnishment of "salaries, wages or other compensation" to garnishment of "earnings". - Amends TCA Title 26, Chapter 2 and Title 29, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 851 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 09/01/2016 | |
2016-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-08 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0952) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0641) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-04-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-04-07 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-07 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1044) |
2016-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-19 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1969 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 851