TN HB1847 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Failed for lack of second in: K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Failed for lack of second in: K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of education to allocate to each local education agency sufficient funds for the LEA to employ one full-time licensed professional school counselor position for every 250 student members of the LEA or one full-time position for each LEA and public charter school within the LEA, whichever is greater; requires each LEA and public charter school to employ a licensed professional school counselor for each position funded. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to school counselors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Failed for lack of second in: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1656 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee