TN HB1899 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes LEAs and public charter schools to employ retired law enforcement officers who are retired from a federal, state, or local law enforcement agency and honorably discharged veterans of the United States armed forces to serve as school resource officers on school premises. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 37; Title 38; Title 49 and Title 62.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 37; Title 38; Title 49 and Title 62, relative to school safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Gino Bulso [R] | Rep. Kip Capley [R] |
Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Jeff Burkhart [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 69, Nays 21, PNV 0 |
2024-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to School Safety Calendar |
2024-02-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2025 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee