TN HB1968 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends, from five business days to 10 calendar days after the conclusion of a tax sale, the deadline by which a court clerk must file a report of sale or other notice reflecting the results of the tax sale, prior to the confirmation of the sale by the court. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 49; Title 54; Title 55; Title 64; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 49; Title 54; Title 55; Title 64; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to property taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2024-03-06 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2248 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee