TN HB1986 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the state of Tennessee, acting by resolution of its funding board, to issue and sell its interest-bearing bonds and bond anticipation notes for certain purposes.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the state of Tennessee, acting by resolution of its funding board, to issue and sell its interest-bearing bonds and bond anticipation notes for certain purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1450 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-19 - Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/20/2011
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1986&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1986.pdf |