TN HB1990 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes release to law enforcement of information regarding the identity of a person who reports a case of suspected abuse, neglect, or exploitation of an adult so that law enforcement may follow up with the person to determine if the report was investigated and resolved. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 5 and Title 71, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, authorizes release to law enforcement of information regarding the identity of a person who reports a case of suspected abuse, neglect, or exploitation of an adult so that law enforcement may follow up with the person to determine if the report was investigated and resolved. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 5 and Title 71, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-10 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0792) |
2020-06-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2894 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020