TN HB2016 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the governor from making a decision on behalf of the state with regard to the resettlement of refugees unless the governor has been previously authorized to do so by joint resolution of the general assembly; restricts authorization by the general assembly to one year from the date an authorizing resolution is adopted. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the governor from making a decision on behalf of the state with regard to the resettlement of refugees unless the governor has been previously authorized to do so by joint resolution of the general assembly; restricts authorization by the general assembly to one year from the date an authorizing resolution is adopted. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2003 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee