TN HB2029 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Def. to Summer Study in Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Def. to Summer Study in Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a manufacturer of agricultural equipment or agricultural equipment parts to provide an owner or independent repair shop access to tools, software, and documentation to allow the provision of services for the equipment. - Amends TCA Title 43 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 43 and Title 47, Chapter 18, relative to agricultural equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2035 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee