TN HB2051 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the bureau to reimburse a public or private air ambulance service that bills for transports and has a base of operations in this state that provides a covered emergency or nonemergency service to a TennCare recipient at a rate not less than 67.5 percent of the federal medicare program's allowable charge for participating providers. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68 and Title 71, relative to TennCare.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action def. in Insurance Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2921 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024