TN HB2094 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the governor from dividing counties into separate declarations of emergency to avoid the requirement that the general assembly approve an extension of an executive order, proclamation, or TEMP beyond the 45-day maximum for the same disaster or occurrence. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 58, Chapter 2, Part 1, relative to emergency management powers of the governor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/21/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1861 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee