TN HB2100 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires financial institutions and insurers to make determinations about the provision or denial of services based on an analysis of risk factors unique to each current or prospective customer; prohibits financial institutions and insurers from denying or canceling services to a person, or otherwise discriminating against a person, based upon the use of a social credit score or other factors. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 45; Title 47 and Title 56.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 9; Title 45; Title 47 and Title 56, relative to consumer protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 3 BY PEARSON AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 23 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY PEARSON AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 21 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - HOUSE BANKING AND CONSUMER AFFAIRS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 3 BY PEARSON AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 23 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY PEARSON AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 21 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - HOUSE BANKING AND CONSUMER AFFAIRS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-03 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-01 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 72, Nays 19 PNV 0 HB2100 |
2024-04-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 6 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0725) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0724) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 70, Nays 23, PNV 0 |
2024-03-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0669) |
2024-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2148 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Sponsor(s) Added.