TN HB2114 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, when legal notices must be published in a newspaper of general circulation, that the notice also be published on a news and information website that has a URL, if such a website exists, that meets certain requirements. - Amends TCA Title 1 and Title 8, Chapter 44.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 1 and Title 8, Chapter 44, relative to public notices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 793 | |
2024-04-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 1 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0891) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-02 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 82, Nays 5, PNV 1 |
2024-04-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0771) |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2317 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 793