TN HB2120 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes TRICOR to enter contractual agreements with counties and cities to provide work training programs for prisoners incarcerated in county and city jails. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 22, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, authorizes TRICOR to enter contractual agreements with counties and cities to provide work training programs for prisoners incarcerated in county and city jails. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 22, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 705 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-06-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-11 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-05-29 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on State Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1809 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 705