TN HB2126 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows a juvenile court to transfer a child, who is 15 or older, to be tried as an adult in criminal court for the offense of organized retail crime, theft of a firearm, or an attempt to commit such offense; revises law with regard to confinement of a child in a local juvenile detention facility, a juvenile detention facility. or an adult detention facility. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 39, relative to acts committed by juveniles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-04-08 | Pub. Ch. 635 | |
2024-04-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-03-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 6 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 72, Nays 24, PNV 0 |
2024-03-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0579) |
2024-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2569 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 635