TN HB2158 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces, from 3,000 to 750, the number of students for which one public school nurse is considered sufficient to adequately provide services for purposes of the Tennessee public school nurse program. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49 and Title 68, relative to school nurses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 1 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0786) |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA1015) |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0786) |
2024-04-11 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0895) |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2703 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-18 - Companion House Bill substituted