TN HB2203 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various changes to the licensing of and prescribing authority for advanced practice registered nurses. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 49; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, makes various changes to the licensing of and prescribing authority for advanced practice registered nurses. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 49; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] |
Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2110 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee