TN HB2208 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expresses the intent of the general assembly that the membership of joint economic and community development boards be representative of the populations of the cities and counties for which the boards are formed. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 58.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 6, Chapter 58, relative to economic and community development boards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2203 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee