TN HB2221 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits an offender who has been convicted of a sexual offense from being eligible for a community-based alternative to incarceration. - Amends TCA Section 40-36-106.
Title
As introduced, prohibits an offender who has been convicted of a sexual offense from being eligible for a community-based alternative to incarceration. - Amends TCA Section 40-36-106.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2152 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.