TN HB2254 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 703
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 703
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds three persons to the state child fatality review team who are each state residents with a child under 18; requires the state child fatality review team to distribute the team's annual report to each local education agency and to the board of the Tennessee Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 36; Title 37 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 36; Title 37 and Title 68, relative to child fatality review teams.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 703 | |
2024-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2445 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/11/2024