TN HB2275 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes, until June 30, 2025, an emergency medical service employee who has been retired for at least 60 days from TCRS from a superseded system administered by the state, or from a local retirement fund to accept employment as an emergency medical services employee without loss or suspension of retirement benefits if certain conditions met. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 8 and Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 8 and Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3, relative to emergency medical services.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Kirk Haston [R] | Rep. Justin Lafferty [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-04-25 | Pub. Ch. 827 | |
2022-04-14 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-30 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0627) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2022-03-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0686) |
2022-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2876 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 827