TN HB2289 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates Cherokee Boat Dock and Resort as a premier type tourist resort for purposes of consuming alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As introduced, designates Cherokee Boat Dock and Resort as a premier type tourist resort for purposes of consuming alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2479 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee