TN HB2310 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Failed in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Failed in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, imposes a fee on certain money transmitter transactions that transmit money from a location originating in this state to a location outside of the United States or its territories. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 45, Chapter 7 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 45, Chapter 7 and Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to money transmission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - HOUSE COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Failed in Commerce Committee (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Failed in Commerce Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2023 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee