TN HB2310 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 69-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a civil cause of action against any person who knowingly removes a minor from this state without the consent of a parent of the minor for the purpose of assisting the minor in obtaining a healthcare procedure that is for the purpose of enabling the minor to identify with, or live as, a purported identity inconsistent with the minor's sex or treating purported discomfort or distress from a discordance between the minor's sex and asserted identity. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39 and Title 68, relative to prohibited medical procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: UNFINISHED BUSINESS MOTION (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-23 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-20 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-13 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2782 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 63, Nays 16 PNV 0