TN HB2330 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 797
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 797
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates Bristol Motor Speedway as a sports authority facility for purposes of the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, designates Bristol Motor Speedway as a sports authority facility for purposes of the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 797 | |
2020-06-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2243 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 797